RI H5998 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratifies amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Tiverton, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of Tiverton on November 4, 2014.
Title
Validating And Ratifying An Amendment To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Tiverton
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2015) |
2015-04-30 | House | House read and passed |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2015) |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-04-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |