RI H5996 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 To The Commerce Corporation To Promote Beer Tourism And The Craft Beer Industry In Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 In Fiscal Year 2017-2018, And Annually Thereafter, To Promote The Growth And Development Of The Craft Brewing Industry And Beer Tourism.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 To The Commerce Corporation To Promote Beer Tourism And The Craft Beer Industry In Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 In Fiscal Year 2017-2018, And Annually Thereafter, To Promote The Growth And Development Of The Craft Brewing Industry And Beer Tourism.)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5996.pdf |