RI H5991 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a rebuttable defense if any person shall die or sustain a personal injury while committing robbery of the owner, lessor, or occupant of a motor vehicle and that the owner or occupant of the vehicle acted in self defense.
Title
Burglary And Breaking And Entering
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5991.pdf |