RI H5990 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the definition of "sexual exploitation" in the domestic abuse prevention law to include acts by any person who knowingly or willfully encourages, aids or coerces any child under the age of eighteen (18) years to engage in commercial sex acts.
Title
Relating To Domestic Relations
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-31 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |