RI H5989 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset on the increase total amount of earnings a partial-unemployment ins. claimant can receive before being entirely disqualified for unemployment ins. benefits/increase in the amount of earnings when calculating a wkly rate to 6/30/25.
Title
Employment Security -- General Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Tina Spears [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-13 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2023) |
2023-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/18/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |