RI H5986 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases penalties for damages to electric/cellular communication lines from $3,000 to $50,000/imprisonment from 2 to10 years, or both/requires restitution for economic harm/increases water supply systems imprisonment to 10 years plus restitution.
Title
Public Utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5986.pdf |