RI H5973 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows unionized firefighters to enter into an agreement which continues all contractual provisions contained in an expiring contract until a successor agreement has been reached.
Title
Firefighters' Arbitration
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 10 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2017-06-01 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |