RI H5973 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Norman Rogers to join Rebecca Choi and Charles Payne in marriage on or about October 9, 2015, within the Town of Portsmouth, Rhode Island
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-04-02 | House | House read and passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/02/2015) |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2015) |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |