RI H5970 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the board of elections to report all votes received by write-in candidates.
Title
Tabulation And Certification Of Returns By State Board
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5970.pdf |