RI H5967 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Ocean State Climate Adaptation and Resilience Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Ocean State Climate Adaptation Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-09HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-07-01SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-30HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/30/2021)
2021-06-28HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-25HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-25HouseScheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-03-18HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021)
2021-02-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback