RI H5964 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for annual report on academic achievement of foster care youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curriculum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Senate Education
2019-05-29HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-05-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/29/2019)
2019-05-15HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-10HouseProposed Substitute
2019-05-10HouseScheduled for consideration (05/15/2019)
2019-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-04-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback