RI H5962 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a lessee of a motor vehicle who purchases the vehicle within one year of the lease inception or any renewal thereof shall be exempt from certain registration transfer provisions.
Title
Transfer Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | House voted to recommit to House Corporations |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-20 | House | Meeting postponed (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-19 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |