RI H5962 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Sky Stanfield To Join Sandra Little And Jesse Steinberg In Marriage Within The City Of Providence, Rhode Island, On Or About August 10, 2013.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Sky Stanfield To Join Sandra Little And Jesse Steinberg In Marriage Within The City Of Providence, Rhode Island, On Or About August 10, 2013.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/14/2013) |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-04-23 | House | House read and passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/23/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5962.pdf |