RI H5959 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strips tax exempt status of municipal detention facility corporation; provides corporation ceases 90 days after dissolution vote and city/town council resolution; requires annual municipal approval of lease.
Title
Municipal Detention Facility Corporations
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5959.pdf |