RI H5953 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the traffic tribunal "The Albert E. DeRobbio Traffic Tribunal."
Title
Joint Committee On Naming New Buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5953.pdf |