RI H5952 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the department of transportation to paint the center yellow lines red, white and blue for the purpose of celebration upon request of the city or town council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction And Maintenance Of State Roads

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023)
2023-03-19HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/23/2023)
2023-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback