RI H5950 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the North Kingstown Municipal Court to issue arrest warrants.
Title
North Kingstown Municipal Court
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5950.pdf |