RI H5944 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Rhode Island State House (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Ri State House From 1/31/18 To 4/30/18, And Commission Expires On 5/30/18.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Rhode Island State House (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Ri State House From 1/31/18 To 4/30/18, And Commission Expires On 5/30/18.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House read and passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |