RI H5940 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Health And Safety Of Pupils
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-25 | House | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Senate Education |
2013-04-25 | House | House read and passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5940.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5940A.pdf |