RI H5937 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Exposed To Violence, And Report Back By February 8, 2022, And Expire On May 8, 2022.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Who Are Exposed To Violence (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study The Impact Of The Trauma Inflicted On Children Exposed To Violence, And Report Back By February 8, 2022, And Expire On May 8, 2022.)
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5937.pdf |