RI H5936 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the implementation of trauma-informed practices in schools throughout the state.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils -- Trauma Informed Schools Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5936.pdf |