RI H5936 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "student loan bill of rights act" which establishes guidelines for the issuance of postsecondary loans.
Title
Student Loan Bill Of Rights Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |