RI H5928 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the prior owner of a parcel of land taken by eminent domain, but unused for the purpose intended, to repurchase at the acquisition price.
Title
Property -- Eminent Domain
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5928.pdf |