RI H5923 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits new high-heat waste processing facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health And Safety- High-heat Waste Facility Act Of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-06HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2021-07-01SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-30SenateRecommended for Immediate Consideration
2021-06-30HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2021-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/30/2021)
2021-06-28HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-25HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-25HouseScheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-04-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback