RI H5918 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Manner In Which Health Insurance, Disability Insurance, Unemployment Insurance, Retirement Plans And Other Traditional Employer Provided Benefits Are Accorded To Uber And Lyft Drivers, Self Employed Individuals, And Other Individuals Engaged In Providing Services To The Public (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study How Various Insurance And Retirement Benefits And Other Traditional Employer Provided Benefits Are Accorded To Various Individuals, And Who Would Report Back By 1/ 5/2022, And Expire On March 5, 2022.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Manner In Which Health Insurance, Disability Insurance, Unemployment Insurance, Retirement Plans And Other Traditional Employer Provided Benefits Are Accorded To Uber And Lyft Drivers, Self Employed Individuals, And Other Individuals Engaged In Providing Services To The Public (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study How Various Insurance And Retirement Benefits And Other Traditional Employer Provided Benefits Are Accorded To Various Individuals, And Who Would Report Back By 1/ 5/2022, And Expire On March 5, 2022.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback