RI H5917 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables some Massachusetts and Connecticut based students transportation providers without Rhode Island licensed and registered vehicles to operate in Rhode Island, under limited conditions.
Title
Pupil Transportation Drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5917.pdf |