RI H5910 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the aggregate value of approved historic tax credits shall not exceed the amount of $150,000,000 together with the amounts available in the historic preservation tax credit fund.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5910.pdf |