RI H5907 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any women's business enterprise that is certified under the Federal Small Business Act shall be deemed certified by the department of administration as a women's business enterprise.
Title
Minority Business Enterprise
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-05-08 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/08/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |