RI H5903 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person/business entity from conditioning requiring offer for sale/lease of tangible personal property on purchase of ins. From any ins. producer/insurer or releasing consumer's personal identification info eff. 1/1/20.
Title
Insurance Consumer Protection Sales Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5903.pdf |