RI H5902 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires prompt processing and payment of Medicaid claims within fifteen (15) calendar days of receipt with interest for failure to notify providers or policyholders of denied or pending claims. Effective 1/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback