RI H5901 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of East Greenwich To Acquire The Property, Assets And Personnel Of The East Greenwich Fire District
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of East Greenwich To Acquire The Property, Assets And Personnel Of The East Greenwich Fire District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/28/2013) |
2013-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2013) |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee heard |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2013) |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-05-01 | House | House read and passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-03-27 | House | Meeting postponed (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/28/2013) |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5901.pdf |