RI H5900 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Examine The Issue Of Licensing Builders And Contractors (creates A Seventeen Member Commission To Examine The Issue Of Licensing Builders And Contractors, And Who Would Report Back To The House No Later Than February 8, 2018; And Would Expire On May 8, 2018.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Examine The Issue Of Licensing Builders And Contractors (creates A Seventeen Member Commission To Examine The Issue Of Licensing Builders And Contractors, And Who Would Report Back To The House No Later Than February 8, 2018; And Would Expire On May 8, 2018.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5900.pdf |