RI H5900 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2016
Title
Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Of the state - fy 2016 approval of amendment lc 002184/20 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 3 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 11 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 11 (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended ruling of the chair: Article 11 (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 13 (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 13 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 12 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 4 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 12 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 7 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 6 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 8 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 9 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 15 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 10 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 9 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 14 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 14 (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 19 (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 5 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 1 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Articles (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 22 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 1 (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 21 (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 20 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 16 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 15 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 15 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 16 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 17 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 20 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 19 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 18 (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 18 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 3 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 11 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 11 (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended ruling of the chair: Article 11 (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 13 (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 13 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 12 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 4 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 12 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 7 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 6 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 8 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 9 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 15 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 11 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 10 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 9 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 14 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 14 (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 19 (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 5 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 1 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Articles (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 22 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 1 (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 21 (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 20 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 16 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 15 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 15 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 16 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage: Article 17 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 20 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 19 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage as amended: Article 18 (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 18 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-15 | House | Scheduled to be heard and /or considered in anticipation of House passage (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2015) |
2015-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2015) |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |