RI H5897 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers jurisdiction of child endangerment offenses from the family court to the superior court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-08HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-08SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2023-05-26SenateScheduled for consideration (05/30/2023)
2023-05-15SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2023-05-02HouseHouse read and passed
2023-04-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/02/2023)
2023-04-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-04-14HouseScheduled for consideration (04/20/2023)
2023-03-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023)
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback