RI H5895 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the Rhode Island public transit authority (RIPTA) to work with the Massachusetts Bay Transit Authority (MBTA) to allow commuter rail passes to be used as dual passes for both RIPTA and MBTA.
Title
Public Transit Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5895.pdf |