RI H5894 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires live streaming, over the Internet, of any open meeting of every municipal and state public body, including the executive departments. Video copies of the meeting are required to be published within twenty-four (24) hours.
Title
Audio And Video Recordings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5894.pdf |