RI H5892 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands definition of "employee" to include a caterer licensed by the department of health and division of taxation and food truck.
Title
Relating To Holidays And Days Of Special Observance
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2019-06-12 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |