RI H5891 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the "open meetings act" to allow virtual meetings and participation by electronic communication until July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/25/2021)
2021-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-19HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2021)
2021-06-14HouseCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2021-06-11HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-11HouseScheduled for hearing (06/14/2021)
2021-03-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback