RI H5885 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that police officers qualify in the use of firearms in both daylight and nighttime conditions two (2) times per year and that correctional officers qualify every year instead of once every two (2) years.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5885.pdf |