RI H5882 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adds hoarding of animals to the list of cruelty to animal offenses, and requires a mental health evaluation for a person convicted of animal cruelty involving hoarding.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Cruelty to animals approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Cruelty to animals approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |