RI H5880 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public utilities posting rate changes for retail service to notify PUC same day.
Title
Regulatory Powers Of Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |