RI H5869 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of North Kingstown (would Ratify The Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of North Kingstown Passed By The Electors In 2010 And 2012)
Title
An Act Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of North Kingstown (would Ratify The Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of North Kingstown Passed By The Electors In 2010 And 2012)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2013-05-01 | House | House read and passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-03-27 | House | Meeting postponed (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2013) |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5869.pdf |