RI H5868 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an eighteen (18) member special commission to reapportion all general assembly districts and congressional districts based on 2020 federal Census data by January 15, 2022.
Title
Special Commission On Reapportionment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5868.pdf |