RI H5864 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes litigation loan agreements subject to state usury statutes.
Title
Litigation Lending Agreements
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5864.pdf |