RI H5862 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Healthy Workplace Act of 2017" and establishes a cause of action against employers and employees for workplace bullying, harassment and other abusive conduct that is tolerated by employers.
Title
Healthy Workplace
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5862.pdf |