RI H5858 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Failing School Choice Act and permits students at failing schools to enroll in any public school and also establishes the Rhode Island education revitalization fund to provide funding to the school choice program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Failing School Choice Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023)
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback