RI H5857 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits employees who are covered by employer sponsored disability insurance programs to elect to be exempt from the state temporary disability insurance program, provided the employer has submitted documentation to the director confirming such coverage.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance - Contributions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5857.pdf |