RI H5853 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Forbids an employer to require an employee to execute a nondisclosure agreement or non-disparagement agreement regarding alleged violations of civil rights or criminal conduct as a condition of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Employment Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2021-06-17HouseHouse read and passed
2021-06-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2021)
2021-06-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-06-04HouseScheduled for consideration (06/09/2021)
2021-03-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback