RI H5853 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry (would Specifically Regulate The Treatment Of Captive Elephants And Would Make The Inhumane Treatment Of Elephants A Felony)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry (would Specifically Regulate The Treatment Of Captive Elephants And Would Make The Inhumane Treatment Of Elephants A Felony)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-04-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013)
2013-03-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback