RI H5852 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires approval by the general assembly to implement eminent domain proceedings for certain types of proposed development plans.
Title
Eminent Domain
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5852.pdf |